MD HB684 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing an income tax checkoff for voluntary contributions to the Maryland Veterans Trust Fund; requiring the Comptroller to include a checkoff on the individual income tax return; requiring the Comptroller to collect and account for contributions made through the checkoff and to credit the proceeds to the Fund after deducting the amount necessary to administer the checkoff; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-12SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2019-03-08HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-08HouseFavorable with Amendments {315669/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-07HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-07HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback