MD HB687 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "sexual abuse"; altering the statute of limitations in certain civil actions relating to child sexual abuse by providing a certain action may be filed at any time; and providing for the retroactive application of the Act to revive any action that was barred by the application of the period of limitations applicable before October 1, 2019, if the action is filed before October 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil Actions – Child Sexual Abuse – Definition and Statute of Limitations (Hidden Predator Act of 2019)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-3) (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {563822/1 (Delegate Dumais) Rejected (3-131) (Y: 4 N: 132 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05SenateUnfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-21SenateHearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (135-3)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-16HouseFloor Amendment {563822/1 (Delegate Dumais) Rejected (3-131)
2019-03-15HouseSpecial Order until 03/16 (Delegate Wilson) Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {172213/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-02-07HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-07HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback