MD HB696 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB462
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each authorized prescriber who receives a financial gratuity or incentive from a pharmaceutical distributor or manufacturer to file a certain disclosure form with the Maryland Health Care Commission within 30 days of the receipt of the financial gratuity or incentive; authorizing the Commission to impose a certain fine under certain circumstances; requiring the Commission to adopt certain regulations; defining certain terms; and providing for the application of the Act.
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Authorized Prescribers - Reporting of Financial Gratuities or Incentives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2019-02-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
HB696 (Carry Over) 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Communications
Dentists
Disclosure
Drugs
Equipment
Ethics
Fines
Forms
Gifts
Health Care Commission
Health Occupations
Industry and Technology
Licenses
Nurses
Penalties and Sentences
Physicians
Podiatrists
Public Health
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Communications
Dentists
Disclosure
Drugs
Equipment
Ethics
Fines
Forms
Gifts
Health Care Commission
Health Occupations
Industry and Technology
Licenses
Nurses
Penalties and Sentences
Physicians
Podiatrists
Public Health
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations