MD HB703 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain jurisdictions to report to the Department of the Environment on certain information relating to the number of cases alleging violations of sediment and erosion control laws and regulations and building and grading permits by January 1 each year; requiring the Department to provide technical assistance to certain jurisdictions to meet the reporting requirements of the Act; and requiring the Department to report the information collected to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before March 1 each year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental Violations - Reporting Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (34-10) (Y: 34 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (109-24) (Y: 110 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 517
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (34-10)
2019-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-11SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (109-24)
2019-03-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-05HouseSpecial Order until 03/06 (Delegate Mautz) Adopted
2019-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {740316/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-07HouseHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback