MD HB704 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 688
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "student data" for purposes of the Maryland Longitudinal Data System to include juvenile delinquency and elementary and secondary school disciplinary records; adding the Department of Juvenile Services to the entities required to provide data to the Maryland Longitudinal Data System; adding the Secretary of Juvenile Services or the Secretary's designee to the Governing Board of the Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Student Data and Governing Board

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-2) (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (114-21) (Y: 114 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (121-18) (Y: 122 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 688
2019-04-03HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (114-21)
2019-04-03HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (43-2)
2019-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments {494833/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-11SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading Passed (121-18)
2019-03-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {905765/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-07HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0704&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0704f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0704t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0704e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_688_hb0704e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0704_90576501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0704_49483301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0004/hb0704.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0704_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0329.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0704_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0962.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1216.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback