MD HB708 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB591
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding eligibility for a property tax exemption for the dwelling house of a disabled veteran to include veterans with a service connected disability of at least 80%; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2020.
Title
Property Tax Exemption - Disabled Veterans
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-30 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB708 (Carry Over) 2020-02-04 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
SB349 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Referred Ways and Means
SB349 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Referred Ways and Means
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 7 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0708?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0708f.pdf |