MD HB71 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing provisions of law establishing educational programs for juveniles in residential facilities under the State Department of Education; establishing the Juvenile Services Education Board in the Department of Juvenile Services; requiring the Board to reflect the diversity of the student population the Department serves; requiring the Board to oversee and approve all educational services to all juveniles who are in a residential facility beginning July 1, 2022; establishing the Juvenile Services Education Program; etc.
Title
Juvenile Services Education Board and Program – Establishment, Powers, and Duties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-3) |
2021-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {812119/1 Adopted |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2021-01-15 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means |
2020-10-02 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB497 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Subjects
Appropriations
Attorney General
Auditors and Audits
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Contracts
Curriculum
Demographics
Education
Education, Boards of
Elections
Higher Education
Investigations and Inquiries
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Open Government
Prerelease and Reentry
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Retirement
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
Sunset
Teachers
Voting
Attorney General
Auditors and Audits
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Contracts
Curriculum
Demographics
Education
Education, Boards of
Elections
Higher Education
Investigations and Inquiries
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Open Government
Prerelease and Reentry
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Retirement
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
Sunset
Teachers
Voting
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Correctional Services | 8 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 22 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 22 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 22 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 22 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 9 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 9 | 502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 9 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 9 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 9 | 505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 9 | 506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 9 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 9 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 9 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 9 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 9 | 605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 9 | 606 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 25 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |