MD HB713 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Office of Personnel Services and Benefits within the Department of Budget and Management to study the number and salaries of certain employees employed by certain State agencies in a position of grade 19 or above who are African American, Hispanic, or any other racial minority and report its findings to the Governor and a certain committee of the General Assembly on or before November 1, 2020, and June 1, 2021; etc.
Title
Office of Personnel Services and Benefits - Study of Diversity of Employees in State Agencies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn |
2020-02-21 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-30 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Demographics
Examinations
Health, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Minorities
Planning, Department of
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Demographics
Examinations
Health, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Minorities
Planning, Department of
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment