MD HB716 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 82
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 82
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission, in consultation with the Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities, the Maternal and Child Health Bureau, the Vital Statistics Administration, and interested stakeholders, to conduct a study on the mortality rates of African American infants and infants in rural areas; requiring the Commission to examine certain factors; requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations, including draft legislation establishing a council on infant mortality, by November 1, 2019; etc.
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Mortality Rates of African American Infants and Infants in Rural Areas - Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 82 |
2018-03-30 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {886589/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-01 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Death
Ethnic Affairs
Health Care Commission
Legislation
Minorities
Minors
Public Health
Reports
Social Services
Committees and Commissions
Death
Ethnic Affairs
Health Care Commission
Legislation
Minorities
Minors
Public Health
Reports
Social Services