MD HB718 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education to establish, by October 1, 2020, a stakeholder advisory group to develop a reading and dyslexia handbook to guide local school systems in the implementation of best practices for early literacy and dyslexia; requiring a completed handbook be made available to the public by June 1, 2021; requiring the development of tools and materials to address certain needs; requiring the Department to update the handbook every 3 years; etc.
Title
State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2020-02-28 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments {675464/1 Adopted |
2020-02-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-30 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB575 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Age
Communications
Curriculum
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Education
Education, State Department of
Industry and Technology
Language
Literacy
Mental and Behavioral Health
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Information
Publications
School Administration
Special Education
Students
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Communications
Curriculum
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Education
Education, State Department of
Industry and Technology
Language
Literacy
Mental and Behavioral Health
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Information
Publications
School Administration
Special Education
Students
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 8 | 420 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |