MD HB720 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to convene the Oyster Advisory Commission, in coordination with the University of Maryland Center for Environmental Science, on or before June 1, 2019; requiring the Department, in coordination with the University of Maryland Center for Environmental Science and the Commission, to develop a package of consensus recommendations regarding the fishery management plan for oysters; requiring the Commission to develop certain recommendations to achieve certain oyster management goals; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural Resources - Fishery Management Plans - Oysters

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-13) (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (99-39) (Y: 99 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (96-39) (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {173429/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (40-89) (Y: 41 N: 90 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2019-04-03HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (99-39)
2019-04-03HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {724639/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (96-39)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-16HouseFloor Amendment {173429/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (40-89)
2019-03-16HouseSpecial Order until later this session (Delegate Adams) Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {530016/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0720&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0720f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0720t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0720e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0720_17342901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0720_53001601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0720_72463901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0000/hb0720.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0720_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0548.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0769.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0720_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1057.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1212.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/veto_letters/hb0720.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback