MD HB721 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB118
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an individual from causing the serious physical injury or death of a vulnerable individual as a result of the individual operating a vehicle in a careless or distracted manner or in violation of any provision of the Maryland Vehicle Law; defining "vulnerable individual" as a pedestrian, including certain workers and emergency services personnel, an individual walking an animal, or an individual lawfully operating certain modes of transport; establishing certain financial penalties and including community service; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2020-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {100912/1 Adopted |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-26 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-17 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-30 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB721 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
SB512 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-30 - Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
SB512 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-30 - Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Subjects
Accidents
Bicycles
Citations
Crimes and Punishments
Death
Disabilities
Driver Education
Drivers' Licenses
Emergency Services
Equipment
Fines
Highways
Injury
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Motorcycles, Mopeds and Motor Scooters
Pedestrians
Penalties and Sentences
Sidewalks
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Vulnerable Adults
Work, Labor and Employment
Bicycles
Citations
Crimes and Punishments
Death
Disabilities
Driver Education
Drivers' Licenses
Emergency Services
Equipment
Fines
Highways
Injury
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Motorcycles, Mopeds and Motor Scooters
Pedestrians
Penalties and Sentences
Sidewalks
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Vulnerable Adults
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 11 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 11 | 145 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 901.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |