MD HB724 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County or of a municipal corporation in Anne Arundel County to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the county or municipal tax imposed on specified real property that is owned by Arundel Habitat for Humanity, Inc.; authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County or of a municipal corporation in Anne Arundel County to provide, by law, for the provisions to carry out the credit; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2010; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Arundel Habitat for Humanity, Inc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-20 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2010-04-01 Third Reading Passed (47-0)
2010-03-31 Second Reading Passed
2010-03-31 Favorable Report Adopted
2010-04-02 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2010-03-24 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-03-19 First Reading Budget and Taxation
2010-03-30 Returned Passed
2010-03-18 Third Reading Passed (137-0)
2010-03-16 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-03-16 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2010-03-15 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2010-02-05 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-02-05 First Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback