MD HB724 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing from 1 year to 3 years the period of time within which a prosecution for a specified sexual offense in the fourth degree must be instituted after the offense was committed, if the victim was a minor at the time of the offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual Offense in the Fourth Degree - Statute of Limitations - Increase

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-10 Approved by the Governor
2011-04-03 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2011-04-02 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2011-04-02 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2011-04-06 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2011-03-24 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2011-04-04 Passed Enrolled
2011-04-04 Third Reading Passed (138-0)
2011-04-04 House Concur - Senate Amendments
2011-03-21 Third Reading Passed (126-12)
2011-03-20 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2011-03-20 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2011-03-21 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2011-02-11 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-02-10 First Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback