MD HB724 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that a fraternal benefit society's risk based capital be determined in accordance with a specified formula set forth in specified instructions; altering the circumstances under which a company action level event occurs in the case of a life insurer; establishing the circumstances under which a company action level event occurs for a fraternal benefit society; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance - Risk Based Capital Standards - Fraternal Benefit Societies and Life Insurers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-02HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 385
2013-04-02HouseReturned Passed
2013-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2013-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed
2013-03-29SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2013-03-29SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2013-03-27SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-03-11SenateFirst Reading Finance
2013-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2013-03-06HouseSecond Reading Passed
2013-03-06HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2013-03-05HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2013-02-21HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-02-04HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback