MD HB725 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that when the interest in a vehicle of one joint owner passes to another joint owner who is the surviving spouse, the surviving spouse is not required to apply for a new certificate of title or submit a specified certificate of title to the Motor Vehicle Administration until a specified time; authorizing a surviving spouse to drive a vehicle and allow the vehicle to be driven on a highway until a specified time without applying for a registration; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Title and Registration - Transfer to Surviving Spouse
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2013-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-08 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2013-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {270810/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:15 p.m. |
2013-02-15 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Death
Fees
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Titles
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Fees
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Titles
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration