MD HB725 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 545
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 545
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing, under specified circumstances, an heir or a personal representative of a deceased licensed dentist who was the owner of a dental practice to serve as an owner of the dental practice for no more than 1 year after the death of the licensed dentist; requiring that all patient care be provided by specified individuals in accordance with specified scopes of practice during the temporary ownership of a dental practice by an heir or a representative of a deceased licensed dentist; etc.
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Death of a Licensed Dentist - Ownership of a Dental Practice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 545 |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (141-0) |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-15 | House | Floor Committee Amendment {906780/1 Adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {996287/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-02 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Death
Dentists
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Licenses
Personal Representatives
Death
Dentists
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Licenses
Personal Representatives