MD HB725 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 691
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Board of Education to provide technical assistance and training to county boards of education regarding the use of restorative approaches on request; requiring certain regulations to incorporate the use of restorative approaches; requiring the State Department of Education to submit to the Governor and the General Assembly, on or before October 1 of each year, a student discipline data report that includes a description of restorative approaches in the State and a review of disciplinary practices and policies; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Schools - Student Discipline - Restorative Approaches

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-5) (Y: 132 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (29-17) (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {153823/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (16-28) (Y: 16 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {623523/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (17-27) (Y: 17 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-3) (Y: 135 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 691
2019-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (132-5)
2019-04-08HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (29-17)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05SenateFloor Amendment {623523/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (17-27)
2019-04-05SenateFloor Amendment {153823/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (16-28)
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {984330/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-04SenateSpecial Order until 4/5 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
2019-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments {984330/1
2019-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-21SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (134-3)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {175562/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-12HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0725&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0725f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0725t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0725e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_691_hb0725e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0725_17556201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0725_98433001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0725_15382301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0725_62352301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0005/hb0725.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0725_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0626.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0725_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1228.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1229.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1306.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1530.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback