MD HB726 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the court to decline to establish a child support order under certain circumstances; specifying that the fact that a parent meets or ceases to meet certain criteria shall constitute a material change of circumstance for the purpose of modification of a child support award; requiring the court to take certain actions if there is a dispute as to whether a parent is voluntarily impoverished; applying the Act only to cases filed on or after October 1, 2019; etc.
Title
Child Support - Potential Income, Voluntary Impoverishment, and No Support Order
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-3) (Y: 135 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-3) |
2019-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Courts
Disabilities
Family Law
Job Training
Literacy
Mental and Behavioral Health
Prisoners
Salaries and Compensation
Support of Dependents
Work, Labor and Employment
Disabilities
Family Law
Job Training
Literacy
Mental and Behavioral Health
Prisoners
Salaries and Compensation
Support of Dependents
Work, Labor and Employment