MD HB728 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing, on or after July 1, 2020, an individual who possesses a valid hunting license to use an off-road vehicle for the purpose of retrieving certain white tailed deer and black bear during a hunting season on roads or trails in any State park or forest where hunting is allowed; providing that a certain authorization does not apply to a State wildland; and requiring a certain off-road vehicle to be registered and operated in accordance with regulations adopted by the Department of Natural Resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Parks and Forests - Hunting - Use of Off-Road Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (111-27) (Y: 112 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-15SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (111-27)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {950615/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback