MD HB728 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB290
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extending from 6 months to 300 days the time periods within which a person claiming to be aggrieved by certain discriminatory acts is required to file a complaint with the Commission on Civil Rights; and providing that a complaint filed with a local human relations commission within certain time periods is deemed to have complied with certain provisions of the Act.
Title
Employment Discrimination – Time for Filing Complaints
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2020-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {436481/1 Adopted |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-01-30 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-30 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
HB728 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
SB1007 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - First Reading Senate Rules
SB1007 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - First Reading Senate Rules
Subjects
Claims
Commission on Civil Rights
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Discrimination
Ethics
Federal Government
Housing
Human Relations
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Commission on Civil Rights
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Discrimination
Ethics
Federal Government
Housing
Human Relations
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 20 | 1004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |