MD HB734 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from knowingly taking, placing, harboring, persuading, inducing, or enticing another to provide services or labor by force, fraud, or coercion; prohibiting a person from knowingly receiving a benefit from the provision of services or labor induced by force, fraud, or coercion; prohibiting a person from knowingly aiding or conspiring with another to commit a violation of the Act; authorizing a State's Attorney or the Attorney General to prosecute a violation of the Act; providing certain penalties; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Labor Trafficking (Anti-Exploitation Act of 2019)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 23 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-1) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {672211/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Abduction
Attorney General
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Extortion
Human Rights
Human Trafficking
Investigations and Inquiries
Mental and Behavioral Health
Penalties and Sentences
State's Attorneys
Threats
Vulnerable Adults
Work, Labor and Employment
Attorney General
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Extortion
Human Rights
Human Trafficking
Investigations and Inquiries
Mental and Behavioral Health
Penalties and Sentences
State's Attorneys
Threats
Vulnerable Adults
Work, Labor and Employment