MD HB735 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Harry R. Hughes Center for Agro-Ecology, in consultation with the Departments of Natural Resources, Environment, Planning, and Agriculture and the Chesapeake Bay Program to conduct a technical study to review changes in forest cover and tree canopy in the State; providing for the scope of the study; and requiring the Harry R. Hughes Center for Agro-Ecology to submit a report of the findings of the technical study to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Technical Study on Changes in Forest Cover and Tree Canopy in Maryland

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (115-22) (Y: 115 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (114-20) (Y: 115 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2019-04-03HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (115-22)
2019-04-03HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {674531/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (114-20)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {470217/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0735&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0735f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0735t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0735e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0735_47021701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0735_67453101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0005/hb0735.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0735_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0587.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0735_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1058.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1213.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback