MD HB739 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 309
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 309
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Law Enforcement Body Camera Task Force; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study the options for economical storage of audio and video recordings made by body-worn cameras and make recommendations for storage considering the budget limitations of State, county, local, and campus law enforcement jurisdictions; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2020; etc.
Title
Law Enforcement Body Camera Task Force
Sponsors
Del. Jazz Lewis [D] | Del. David Moon [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 309 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-5) |
2020-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {622913/1 Adopted |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2020-01-30 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-30 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Law Enforcement
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Recordings
Reports
Storage
Sunset
Video
Committees and Commissions
Law Enforcement
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Recordings
Reports
Storage
Sunset
Video