MD HB740 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 77-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from possessing, selling, offering to sell, transferring, purchasing, or receiving a firearm manufactured using a computer-aided fabrication device unless the firearm is imprinted with a serial number issued by a federally licensed firearms manufacturer or importer; establishing penalties of up to 5 years imprisonment or a fine of up to $5,000, or both for violations of the Act; requiring, by September 30, 2019, the Department of State Police to develop a plan for a State system for the registration of certain firearms; etc.
Title
Criminal Law – Firearms – Computer–Aided Fabrication and Serial Number (3–D Printed Firearms )
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (94-45) (Y: 95 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {123222/2 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (47-85) (Y: 48 N: 86 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {313527/2 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (41-91) (Y: 42 N: 92 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {123222/2 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (47-85) (Y: 48 N: 86 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {313527/2 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (41-91) (Y: 42 N: 92 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (94-45) |
2019-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-16 | House | Floor Amendment {313527/2 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (41-91) |
2019-03-16 | House | Floor Amendment {123222/2 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (47-85) |
2019-03-15 | House | Special Order until 03/16 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {582918/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 10:00 a.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Guns
Identification
Industry and Technology
Penalties and Sentences
Registration
Reports
State Police, Department of
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Guns
Identification
Industry and Technology
Penalties and Sentences
Registration
Reports
State Police, Department of
Telecommunications and Information Technology