MD HB743 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-05 - Senators Lee, Hough, and Waldstreicher
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-05 - Senators Lee, Hough, and Waldstreicher
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that a certain required dismissal of a certain charge against a defendant found incompetent to stand trial is without prejudice.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility - Dismissal of Charges
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senators Lee, Hough, and Waldstreicher |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede |
2019-04-04 | House | Delegates Sydnor, Moon, and Arikan |
2019-04-04 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-04-04 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2019-04-04 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {898471/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {452515/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Mental and Behavioral Health
Murder
Statutes of Limitation
Trials
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Mental and Behavioral Health
Murder
Statutes of Limitation
Trials