MD HB744 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a landlord to make a certain disclosure to prospective tenants if the landlord uses a ratio utility billing system; requiring that a certain lease provision is unenforceable if a landlord fails to make a certain disclosure; requiring a landlord to provide a tenant with information to document a bill for certain utilities; providing that a tenant organization has the right of free assembly in certain areas within an apartment facility during reasonable hours and on reasonable notice to the landlord; etc.
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act)
Sponsors
Del. Vaughn Stewart [D] | Del. Regina Boyce [D] | Del. Erek Barron [D] | Del. Alfred Carr [D] |
Del. David Moon [D] | Del. Julie Palakovich Carr [D] | Del. Emily Shetty [D] | Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2020-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {390019/1 Adopted |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-31 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Apartments
Boundaries
Communications
Counties
Courts
Damages
Disclosure
Domestic Violence
Escrow Accounts
Ethics
Evidence
Fees
Harassment
Health Occupations
Hearings
Housing
Inspections
Interest
Landlord and Tenant
Laws and Ordinances
Leases and Rent
Liability
Names
Notaries Public
Notices
Physicians
Postal Service
Prices
Privacy
Property Damage
Protection Orders
Psychologists
Real Property
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
Signatures
Social Workers
Time
Utilities
Victims
Apartments
Boundaries
Communications
Counties
Courts
Damages
Disclosure
Domestic Violence
Escrow Accounts
Ethics
Evidence
Fees
Harassment
Health Occupations
Hearings
Housing
Inspections
Interest
Landlord and Tenant
Laws and Ordinances
Leases and Rent
Liability
Names
Notaries Public
Notices
Physicians
Postal Service
Prices
Privacy
Property Damage
Protection Orders
Psychologists
Real Property
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
Signatures
Social Workers
Time
Utilities
Victims
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 8 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8 | 212.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8 | 218 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8 | 5A-05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8 | 5A-08 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8-5A | 01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8-5A | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8-5A | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8-5A | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8-5A | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8-5A | 6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |