MD HB748 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing that an electric low speed scooter is considered to be a bicycle for the purposes of the Maryland Vehicle Law; providing that an electric low speed scooter is not a motorized minibike, motor scooter, or motor vehicle for the purposes of the Maryland Vehicle Law; establishing that the operator of an electric low speed scooter may ride by standing on a certain platform; providing that provisions of the Maryland Vehicle Law do not prevent a local authority from regulating, in its jurisdiction, the operation of bicycles; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Electric Low Speed Scooters

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 227
2019-04-04HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2019-04-04HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (43-0)
2019-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments {988678/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {640715/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0748&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0748f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0748t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0748e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_227_hb0748e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0748_64071501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0748_98867801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0008/hb0748.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0748_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0513.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0748_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1107.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1335.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback