MD HB75 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System is required to include certain investment management service fees, including fixed fees, performance fees, fees that are formally invoiced, and fees that are not formally invoiced in a certain report to the General Assembly.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Management Fee Reporting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-25 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-23 | House | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-17 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Data
Disclosure
Fees
Investments
Records
Reports
Retirement Systems
Revenue and Taxes
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Data
Disclosure
Fees
Investments
Records
Reports
Retirement Systems
Revenue and Taxes
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement