MD HB750 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations from requiring a second or subsequent prior authorization for the continued use of a medical device or oxygen that is prescribed for a chronic condition except under certain circumstances; and applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance - Prior Authorizations - Medical Devices or Oxygen

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
2019-02-13HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback