MD HB752 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment, by October 1, 2020, to adopt regulations to establish procedures for conducting environmental investigations to determine lead hazards for children under the age of 6 years and pregnant women with elevated blood lead levels greater than or equal to 10 micrograms per deciliter; altering the conditions under which an owner of an affected property is required to comply with certain risk reduction standards; requiring the Department to report annually on the investigations required under the Act; etc.
Title
Environment - Lead Hazards - Environmental Investigation, Reporting, and Risk Reduction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2019-02-25 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Chemical Tests
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Housing
Investigations and Inquiries
Minors
Pregnancy
Real Property
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Weights and Measures
Women
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Housing
Investigations and Inquiries
Minors
Pregnancy
Real Property
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Weights and Measures
Women