MD HB752 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from using a scanning device to scan or swipe an individual's identification card or a driver's license to obtain personal information; prohibiting a person from retaining, selling, or transferring any information collected from scanning or swiping an individual's identification card or driver's license; providing that the Act does not prohibit a law enforcement officer from using a scanning device to record, retain, or transmit information if acting within the scope of the officer's official duties; etc.
Title
Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2020-02-18 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-31 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB34 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Subjects
Age
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Crimes and Punishments
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Communication
Electronic Funds Transfer
Equipment
Financial Institutions
Fraud
Identification
Law Enforcement
Licenses
Photography
Privacy
Retail Sales
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Crimes and Punishments
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Communication
Electronic Funds Transfer
Equipment
Financial Institutions
Fraud
Identification
Law Enforcement
Licenses
Photography
Privacy
Retail Sales
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 13 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 1327 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |