MD HB754 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that certain provisions of the Act apply to pharmacy benefits managers that contract with managed care organizations in the same manner as they apply to pharmacy benefits managers that contract with carriers; prohibiting a certain contract or amendment from becoming effective unless the contract or amendment is filed with the Commissioner for approval or disapproval by a certain time; requiring that each contract between a pharmacy benefits manager and a contracted pharmacy include a certain dispute resolution process; etc.
Title
Health Insurance and Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Cost Pricing and Reimbursement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {276784/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Appeals
Claims
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Drugs
Emergency Bills
Equipment
Fees
Health Care Commission
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Planning and Cost Review
Insurance - Health
Investigations and Inquiries
Nonprofit Organizations
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Prices
Public Information
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Rules and Regulations
Claims
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Drugs
Emergency Bills
Equipment
Fees
Health Care Commission
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Planning and Cost Review
Insurance - Health
Investigations and Inquiries
Nonprofit Organizations
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Prices
Public Information
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Rules and Regulations