MD HB759 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 550
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 550
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, except for certain specialty drugs, a pharmacy benefits manager from requiring that a beneficiary use a specific pharmacy or entity to fill a prescription if the pharmacy benefits manager or a corporate affiliate has an ownership interest in the pharmacy or entity or if the pharmacy or entity has an ownership interest in the pharmacy benefits manager or a corporate affiliate.
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Pharmacy Choice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 550 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {496080/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Consumer Protection
Drugs
Health Insurance
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Consumer Protection
Drugs
Health Insurance
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers