MD HB76 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the penalties for a person convicted for possession of a canceled, revoked, or suspended driver's license to be a fine not exceeding $500 and an assessment of 3 points.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Canceled, Revoked, and Suspended Driver's Licenses - Penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-2) (Y: 140 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-2) (Y: 140 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-2) |
2019-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {930117/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-17 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Drivers' Licenses
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Drivers' Licenses
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration