MD HB761 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-7)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the duties of the Statewide Steering Committee on Services for Adults with Sickle Cell Disease to include the provision of certain resources for detecting sickle cell disease and supporting individuals with sickle cell disease; authorizing the Maryland Department of Health to provide certain services relating to sickle cell disease in consultation with the Steering Committee; requiring the Department to provide certain services through community-based organizations to the extent practicable; etc.
Title
Health – Sickle Cell Disease – Steering Committee and Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {486883/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Caregivers
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Contracts
Disclosure
Diseases
Education
Examinations
Health
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Laboratories
Medical Research
Medical Treatments
Notices
Nurses
Patients
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Pregnancy
Prices
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Social Services
Social Workers
Caregivers
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Contracts
Disclosure
Diseases
Education
Examinations
Health
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Laboratories
Medical Research
Medical Treatments
Notices
Nurses
Patients
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Pregnancy
Prices
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Social Services
Social Workers