MD HB761 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 317
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 317
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that certain limitations on the duration of certain tax exemptions for certain manufacturing property in Somerset County do not apply to an exemption granted to Eastern Shore Forest Products, Inc.
Title
Somerset County - Property Tax Exemption for Manufacturing Property - Eastern Shore Forest Products, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 317 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-31 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Somerset County | 11 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |