MD HB766 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing professional land surveyors and licensed landscape architects to certify silt and erosion control plans in the Severn River Watershed.
Title
Environment - Severn River Watershed - Silt and Erosion Control - Certification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139 |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2013-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-12 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate McIntosh) {193828/1 Adopted |
2013-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {580316/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m. |
2013-02-21 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-06 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Annapolis
Anne Arundel County
Building Permits
Environment
Erosion
Landscape Architects
Licenses
Rivers and Streams
Sediment Control
Soil Conservation
Surveyors
Anne Arundel County
Building Permits
Environment
Erosion
Landscape Architects
Licenses
Rivers and Streams
Sediment Control
Soil Conservation
Surveyors