MD HB766 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Third Reading Passed (114-25)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Third Reading Passed (114-25)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Legislative Services, in consultation with certain entities, to undertake a technical study to review changes in forest cover and tree canopy in the State; requiring the study to include surveys and mapping and certain analyses related to forest conservation; requiring the Department to submit the study and a certain programmatic review to the Governor and the General Assembly by November 15, 2018; requiring the Department to convene a work session by November 30, 2018, to consider certain findings; etc.
Title
Forest Conservation – Technical Study and Programmatic Review
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (114-25) (Y: 115 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {763724/1 (Delegate Impallaria) Rejected (46-87) (Y: 47 N: 88 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {763724/1 (Delegate Impallaria) Rejected (46-87) (Y: 47 N: 88 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (114-25) |
2018-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-09 | House | Floor Amendment {763724/1 (Delegate Impallaria) Rejected (46-87) |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {180018/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-01 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Agriculture, Department of
Chesapeake Bay
Conservation
Environment, Department of
Foresters
Forests and Parks
Legislative Services, Department of
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Planning, Department of
Publications
Reports
Sunset
Trees
Chesapeake Bay
Conservation
Environment, Department of
Foresters
Forests and Parks
Legislative Services, Department of
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Planning, Department of
Publications
Reports
Sunset
Trees