MD HB774 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to study and compile information regarding certain matters that relate to certain crime firearms; requiring the Department of State Police to provide certain information for the study; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2020; etc.
Title
Governor’s Office of Crime Control and Prevention – Crime Firearms – Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2019-04-08 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-03 | House | Special Order until 04/04 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {912315/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 10:00 a.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Attorney General
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Guns
Interstate Affairs
Licenses
Public Safety
Reports
State Police, Department of
Storage
Sunset
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Guns
Interstate Affairs
Licenses
Public Safety
Reports
State Police, Department of
Storage
Sunset