MD HB778 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Baltimore Police Department to investigate the hiring practices of the Department in order to determine the reasons the Department has failed to hire staff in positions where funds have already been allocated; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2019; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study the Baltimore Police Department
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2019-02-21 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Committees and Commissions
Law Enforcement
Legislative Services, Department of
Public Safety
Reports
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Law Enforcement
Legislative Services, Department of
Public Safety
Reports
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment