MD HB78 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 749
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 749
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State designated exchange to participate in a certain advisory committee, maintain a certain data set, and provide data under certain circumstances; authorizing the State designated exchange to use certain data to improve outcomes for patients; establishing the Maryland Commission on Health Equity to employ a health equity framework by taking a collaborative approach to improve health outcomes and reduce health inequities in the State and incorporating health considerations into broad-based decision making; etc.
Title
Public Health - Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan-Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021)
Sponsors
Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D] | Del. Robbyn Lewis [D] | Del. Charlotte Crutchfield [D] | Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D] |
Del. Nicole Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 749 |
2021-03-30 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-12) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2021-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-39) |
2021-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {576685/1 Adopted |
2021-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-12-23 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2020-08-03 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB52 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 750
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Aging, Department of
Agriculture, Department of
Budget and Management, Department of
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Correction, Division of
Data
Demographics
Disabilities, Department of
Disclosure
Discrimination
Education, State Department of
Ethics
Food
General Assembly
General Services, Department of
Health
Health and Higher Educational Facilities Authority
Health Occupations
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Information Technology, Department of
Insurance Administration
Job Training
Juvenile Services, Department of
Labor, Department of
meetings
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minorities
Natural Resources, Department of
Planning, Department of
Public Health
Public Information
Records
Reports
Safety
School Administration
State Police, Department of
Transportation, Department of
Veterans Affairs, Department of
Work, Labor, and Employment
Aging, Department of
Agriculture, Department of
Budget and Management, Department of
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Correction, Division of
Data
Demographics
Disabilities, Department of
Disclosure
Discrimination
Education, State Department of
Ethics
Food
General Assembly
General Services, Department of
Health
Health and Higher Educational Facilities Authority
Health Occupations
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Information Technology, Department of
Insurance Administration
Job Training
Juvenile Services, Department of
Labor, Department of
meetings
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minorities
Natural Resources, Department of
Planning, Department of
Public Health
Public Information
Records
Reports
Safety
School Administration
State Police, Department of
Transportation, Department of
Veterans Affairs, Department of
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 13 | 4201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 4 | 302.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |