MD HB781 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations that provide specified health insurance benefits under specified insurance policies or contracts to provide coverage for specified equipment and supplies used for the treatment of ostomies; providing that the required coverage may be subject to specified deductibles and coinsurance; providing for the application of the Act; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Ostomy Equipment and Supplies - Required
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-1) |
2015-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {246083/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-19 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Equipment
Fees
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
Records
Rules and Regulations
Fees
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
Records
Rules and Regulations