MD HB782 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the eligibility for the filing of a certain motion to vacate judgment if the person's participation in the offense was a direct result of being a victim of human trafficking; requiring that a certain motion be served on a certain State's Attorney; requiring that a certain motion be mailed to a victim or victim's representative at a certain address if the qualifying offense occurred within 5 years before the filing of the motion; requiring the court to take certain factors into consideration when making a certain finding; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-7) (Y: 132 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-7) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {102512/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Burglary
Checks
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Courts
Criminal Law - Procedure
Drivers' Licenses
Drugs
Equipment
Ex-Offenders
Expungement
Fraud
Hearings
Human Trafficking
Judgments
Loitering
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Registration
Nudity and Sexual Displays
Prostitution
Sexual Offenses
State's Attorneys
Theft
Trespass
Vandalism
Victims
Checks
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Courts
Criminal Law - Procedure
Drivers' Licenses
Drugs
Equipment
Ex-Offenders
Expungement
Fraud
Hearings
Human Trafficking
Judgments
Loitering
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Registration
Nudity and Sexual Displays
Prostitution
Sexual Offenses
State's Attorneys
Theft
Trespass
Vandalism
Victims