MD HB786 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, to the extent reasonably possible, the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to adhere to the standards of the American Corrections Association for restrictive housing in State correctional facilities.
Title
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Limitations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-5) (Y: 132 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-5) |
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {982614/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2018-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-01 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Correctional Institutions
Developmental Disabilities
Elderly Persons
Health
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Pregnancy
Prisoners
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Sexual Orientation
Developmental Disabilities
Elderly Persons
Health
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Pregnancy
Prisoners
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Sexual Orientation