MD HB786 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Delegates Clippinger, Lopez, and Moon
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Delegates Clippinger, Lopez, and Moon
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a person who is not a certain licensee may not complete the transfer of a certain rifle or shotgun as transferor or transferee, except under certain circumstances; requiring, before a certain transfer is conducted, the transferor and transferee to meet jointly with a certain licensee and request that the licensee facilitate the transfer; requiring a licensee to take certain actions when facilitating a transfer; etc.
Title
Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Secondary Transactions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (90-49) (Y: 91 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {513723/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (38-91) (Y: 39 N: 92 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {893821/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (44-88) (Y: 45 N: 89 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (90-49) (Y: 91 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {513723/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (38-91) (Y: 39 N: 92 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {893821/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (44-88) (Y: 45 N: 89 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Delegates Clippinger, Lopez, and Moon |
2019-04-08 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-04-08 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2019-04-08 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-14) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment {713624/2 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {708570/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {708570/1 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (90-49) |
2019-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-16 | House | Floor Amendment {513723/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (38-91) |
2019-03-16 | House | Floor Amendment {893821/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (44-88) |
2019-03-16 | House | Floor Amendment {723222/1 (Delegate Mautz) Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Floor Amendment {603226/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Special Order until later this session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Special Order until 03/16 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {832918/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 10:00 a.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Dealers
Education
Expungement
Fees
Fingerprinting
Fraud
Guns
Historical Matters
Identification
Law Enforcement
Leases and Rent
Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
Records
Registration
Residency
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
State Police, Department of
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Dealers
Education
Expungement
Fees
Fingerprinting
Fraud
Guns
Historical Matters
Identification
Law Enforcement
Leases and Rent
Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
Records
Registration
Residency
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
State Police, Department of