MD HB787 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-04 - Hearing cancelled
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Board of Elections to establish guidelines for a subsequent absentee ballot list; requiring that a voter who receives an absentee ballot be provided the opportunity to request an absentee ballot for the next subsequent election in specified materials accompanying the absentee ballot; requiring that a voter who requests an absentee ballot for the next subsequent election be placed on the subsequent election absentee ballot list; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law - Subsequent Election Absentee Ballot List

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-04 Hearing cancelled
2011-03-29 Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-03-25 First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2011-03-25 Third Reading Passed (98-38)
2011-03-24 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2011-03-24 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2011-03-25 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2011-02-14 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-02-10 First Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback