MD HB787 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-25 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the requirement that a defendant must be charged specifically with reckless endangerment to be found guilty of reckless endangerment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Reckless Endangerment - Repeal of Specific Charging Requirement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (77-57) (Y: 77 N: 57 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-25SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2013-03-25HouseThird Reading Passed (77-57)
2013-03-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-03-19HouseSpecial Order until 3/20 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted
2013-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments {262913/1 Report Adopted
2013-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2013-02-26HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-02-06HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback