MD HB787 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Public Service Commission to open a proceeding to determine appropriate targets and policies for specified electric companies to procure energy storage systems by January 1, 2021, and January 1, 2026; providing for the consideration of specified matters in the proceeding; requiring the Commission to adopt targets by October 1, 2018; requiring the Commission to reevaluate specified determinations in a specified manner; providing for the scope and application of the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electricity - Energy Storage Systems (Storage Technology and Electric Power (STEP) Act)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-14HouseUnfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
2016-02-25HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-08HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback