MD HB787 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 54
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing that persons who are required to provide notice of suspected child abuse or neglect of a child or make a written report of suspected child abuse or neglect may not knowingly fail to provide the required notice or make the written report if the person has actual knowledge of the abuse or neglect; establishing that a violation of the Act is a misdemeanor; providing certain penalties; and applying the Act only to a failure to report child abuse or neglect that occurs during the time the child is a minor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 54
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (43-0)
2019-04-08SenateSenate Recede
2019-04-05SenateSpecial Order until 4/8 (Senator Hough) Adopted
2019-04-04HouseDelegates Moon, W. Fisher, and Grammer
2019-04-04HouseConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-04HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede
2019-04-04HouseHouse Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {858274/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {782517/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-02-08HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0787&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0787f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0787t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_54_hb0787t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0787_78251701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0787_85827401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0007/hb0787.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0787_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0652.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0787_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1052.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1332.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback